Wheeler v. Cook Group Inc et al
Plaintiff: James Wheeler
Defendant: Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC, Cook Group Inc and William Cook Europe APS
Case Number: 2:2021cv00850
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Indiana Southern for inclusion in MDL; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk electronically to Clerk of Court in District of Indiana Southern. (KEK)
July 21, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Wheeler. Cook Group Inc served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (Bross, William)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 HAIKALA CHAMBERS INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 6/23/2021. (KEK)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cook Group Inc, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC, William Cook Europe APS. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK)
June 23, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3868673. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Cook Group Inc, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC, William Cook Europe APS, filed by James Wheeler.(KEK). (Bross, William)
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cook Group Inc, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC, William Cook Europe APS, filed by James Wheeler.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler v. Cook Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Cook Europe APS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wheeler
Represented By: William L Bross, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?