McDole v. Fielding et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey McDole
Defendant: Birmingham, City of and Officer Fielding
Case Number: 2:2021cv00904
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER - With the filing of Defendant City of Birmingham's answer, Doc. #3 , the court VACATES its order to show cause, Doc. #2 . Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 8/30/21. (MRR, )
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings- with appendices I, II, & III attached. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 8/27/21. (MRR, )
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Birmingham, City of.(Love, James)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 **VACATED**ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- Mr. McDole is ORDERED to show cause on or before September 7, 2021 as to why his claims against the City of Birmingham should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 8/26/21. (MRR, )**VACATED pursuant to Order Doc 5** on 8/30/2021 (MRR, ).
July 6, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number B4601114409 (MRR, )
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-cv-2021-901613., filed by Birmingham, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(MRR, )
July 2, 2021 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jeffrey McDole.-Deemed filed 5/28/21, Circuit Court of Jefferson County (Doc 1-1 p.7 of combined pdf)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDole v. Fielding et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birmingham, City of
Represented By: James D Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Fielding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey McDole
Represented By: Kimberly Kee Augustus-Tucker
Represented By: Terrell E McCants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?