Davis et al v. TK Elevator Corporation
Plaintiff: Rhonda Davis, Dustin Davis and Gwyndal Moore
Defendant: Grandview Medical Center and TK Elevator Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv00926
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: certain time limits apply as set out in this order; Discovery due by 5/27/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 6/24/2022. The parties shall be ready for trial, to be scheduled by separate order, on or before October 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 8/26/2021. (KAM)
August 26, 2021 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Teel, Al)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER - GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on August 18, 2021. (MEB2)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to change the style of the case to reflect TK Elevator Corporation as the sole Defendant in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 08/18/2021. (SUH)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER The Telephone Conference scheduled for 8/18/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on August 18, 2021. (ASL)
August 18, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden filed by Rhonda Davis, Dustin Davis, TK Elevator Corporation, Gwyndal Moore (KAM)
August 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE to remind parties of consent conference scheduled at 10:00 AM on Wednesday, August 18, 2021; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, the conference will be cancelled (ASL)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge after 8/29/2021 unless they unanimously consent to the dispositive jurisdiction of magistrate judge; Telephone Conference set for Wednesday, 8/18/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden; parties to call as directed; if all parties submit an executed consent before 8/29/2021, the telephone conference will be cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 7/29/2021. (MEB2)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on July 29, 2021. (MEB2)
July 15, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by TK Elevator Corporation.(Teel, Al)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TK Elevator Corporation. filed by TK Elevator Corporation (Teel, Al)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TK Elevator Corporation from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 20-cv-903841. (), filed by TK Elevator Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A part 1, #2 Exhibit A part 2, #3 Exhibit B)(KAM)
July 8, 2021 AMENDED COMPLAINT deemed filed on 5/21/2021 in state court.(KAM)
July 8, 2021 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT deemed filed 7/8/2021 in state court(KAM)
July 8, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3879227. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TK Elevator Corporation from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 20-cv-903841. (), filed by TK Elevator Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A part 1, # 2 Exhibit A part 2, # 3 Exhibit B)(KAM). (Teel, Al) NDL rec#B4601114496 Modified on 7/12/2021 (KAM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. TK Elevator Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Davis
Represented By: Stephen K Wollstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Davis
Represented By: Stephen K Wollstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwyndal Moore
Represented By: Stephen K Wollstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grandview Medical Center
Represented By: Melissa M Sinor
Represented By: Walter J Price, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TK Elevator Corporation
Represented By: Al Foster Teel
Represented By: John P Kavanagh, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?