Jackson v. Complete Payment Recovery Services Inc
Plaintiff: ZelQuilla Jackson
Defendant: Complete Payment Recovery Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00933
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE-Plaintiff has submitted a notice of dismissal. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the case be and hereby is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, costs to be taxed as paid. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 08/10/2021. (AKD)
August 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ZelQuilla Jackson (Philipps, David)
July 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by ZelQuilla Jackson of Settlement (Philipps, David)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice attorneys David J. Philipps and Mary E. Phillips, but with the understanding and on the condition they pay the applicable fee and register for e-filing and notification within 14 days, unless they have already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 7/12/2021. (AVC)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion is RIPE 7/9/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by ZelQuilla Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Local Counsel)(AKD)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by ZelQuilla Jackson. (AKD)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Complete Payment Recovery Services Inc, filed by ZelQuilla Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(AKD)
July 9, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3880111 (ALND receipt# B4601114524). (Philipps, David) Modified on 7/9/2021 (AKD).
July 9, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3880102 (ALND receipt# B4601114523). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Complete Payment Recovery Services Inc, filed by ZelQuilla Jackson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(AKD). (Philipps, David) Modified on 7/9/2021 (AKD).
July 9, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3880115 (ALND receipt# B4601114525). (Philipps, David) Modified on 7/9/2021 (AKD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Complete Payment Recovery Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZelQuilla Jackson
Represented By: Bradford W Botes
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Complete Payment Recovery Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?