Spangler v. Speaks et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Marcus Montez Spangler
Defendant: Keller Speaks, Randy Brown, Phyllis Morgan, Captain Johnson and Alabama Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2021cv00965
Filed: July 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Southern Office
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 motion or declaration for leave to proceed in forma pauperis.Plaintiff is required to pay a partial filing fee of $139.70. Plaintiff is required to return signed attached consent form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 08/17/2021. (AKD)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcus Montez Spangler. (AKD)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #2 Motion to proceed informa pauperis filed by Marcus Montez Spangler; Although the plaintiff filed an application to proceed in forma pauperis, the application was not accompanied by a certified copy of prison account statements for the last six months. The plaintiff must file a new verified application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a certified copy of jail and/or prison account statements for the last six months. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 07/26/2021. (AKD)
July 15, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:21-cv-00426. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: it is ORDERED that: 1. The #3 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; 2. This case is transferred to the US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama pursuant to the provisions of 28 USC 1404(a); The Clerk is DIRECTED to undertake those measures necessary to effectuate the transfer of this case; This case is Closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 7/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(bes, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/15/2021.]
July 15, 2021 Case transferred to Northern District of Alabama; ELECTRONICALLY transferred via CM/ECF to Clerk. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/15/2021.]
July 13, 2021 No objections received re #3 Recommendation. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/15/2021.]
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge that this case be TRANSFERRED to the US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama in accordance with the directives of 28 USC 1404(a); Objections to R&R due by 7/8/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/24/2021. (bes, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/15/2021.]
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Marcus Montez Spangler. (es, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/15/2021.] Modified on 7/15/2021 (KEK).
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Randy Brown, Alabama Department of Corrections, Captain Johnson, Phyllis Morgan, Keller Speaks, filed by Marcus Montez Spangler.(es, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/24/2021 to correct portion of page 3 that had words cut off) (bes, ). Modified on 6/24/2021 to correct Dft name as Alabama Department of Corrections (bes, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/15/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spangler v. Speaks et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Montez Spangler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keller Speaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?