Harding et al v. Birmingham, City of
Plaintiff: Samantha Harding and Moneka Chante Moore
Defendant: Birmingham, City of
Case Number: 2:2021cv01002
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER-Certain time limits apply as set out herein; Objection to Mediation by March 22, 2022; Discovery due by April 29,2022; Dispositive Motions due by May 27,2022; Final Pretrial Conference set for January 5,2023 09:30 a.m. and Jury Trial set for February 6,2023 at 09:00 a.m. BOTH in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 09/08/2022. (AKD)
September 2, 2021 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Fullerton, Frederic)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS reminding parties of their obligations under FRCP26(f) - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 8/17/2021. (KSS)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL- Rule 26 Meeting Report due by September 16,2021; Pretrial Conference set for January 5, 2023 at 9:30 a.m and Jury Trial set for February 6,2023 at 09:00 a.m BOTH in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 08/16/2021. (AKD)
August 13, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Abdul K. Kallon. Please use case number 2:21-cv-1002-AKK on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. The status conference set for August 16, 2021 is CANCELLED. (MRR, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE to remind parties of consent telephone conference scheduled for 11:00 AM on Monday, 8/16/2021; if ALL parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, 24 hours in advance, the conference will be cancelled. (BST)
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha A Chandler on behalf of Birmingham, City of (Chandler, Samantha)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than September 9, 2021. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after September 9, 2021. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 11:00 a.m. on August 16, 2021. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/28/21. (MRR, )
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/1/2021; Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/28/2021. (BST)
July 26, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Birmingham, City of.(Fullerton, Frederic)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 68-cv-2021-900289., filed by Birmingham, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(MRR, )
July 22, 2021 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Samantha Harding, Moneka Chante Moore.- Deemed filed 6/4/21, Circuit Court of Jefferson County (Doc 1-1 p.7 of combined pdf)(MRR, )
July 22, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number B4601114773 (MRR, )
July 22, 2021 NOTICE of Appearance by Johnathan Fitzgerald Austin on behalf of Samantha Harding, Moneka Chante Moore- Deemed served 6/7/21, Circuit Court of Jefferson County (Doc 1-1 p.33 of combined pdf) (MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harding et al v. Birmingham, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Harding
Represented By: Richard Allan Rice
Represented By: Johnathan Fitzgerald Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moneka Chante Moore
Represented By: Richard Allan Rice
Represented By: Johnathan Fitzgerald Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birmingham, City of
Represented By: Frederic L Fullerton, II
Represented By: Samantha A Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?