Lyons v. Granite Construction Company Inc et al
Plaintiff: Bonderia Lyons
Defendant: Granite Construction Company Inc, Volkert Inc, Russo Corporation, Tortorigi Construction Inc, Abramson LLC, A G Peltz Group LLC, Daystar Enterprises LLC, Darrell Brown Trucking Inc, A-1 Sealing Inc, Alabama Guardrail Inc, Mill It Up LLC, Penhall Company Inc, Peterson Contractors Inc, Ross Tortorigi Inc, Sweeping Corporation of America Inc, Synergy Earth Systems LLC, Thomas Land Clearing & Construction Inc doing business as Thomas Land Clearing Company, Davidson Trucking, Inc., JEM Hardscapes LLC and Nichols Concrete Equipment Company Inc
Intervenor Plaintiff: Axis Surplus Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv01040
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 NOTICE of Change of Address by David M Wilson (Wilson, David)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 JOINDER in re #93 , #90 , #91 , #89 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Ross Tortorigi Inc. (Bolvig, C)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants plaintiffs' unopposed motion for extension of time. (Doc. #106 ). Plaintiffs shall please file their reply brief(s) in support of their Motion to Remand on or before October 11, 2021. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/27/2021. (YMB)
September 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Reply Brief in support of Motion to Remand by Bonderia Lyons. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 JOINDER in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by A-1 Sealing Inc. (Voss, Mickey) Modified on 9/27/2021 (KEK).
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 JOINDER in re #93 , #90 , #79 , #91 , #89 Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Nichols Concrete Equipment Company Inc. (Wilson, David)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 JOINDER in Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by JEM Hardscapes LLC. (Gann, M)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 JOINDER in Defendant Granite Construction Company, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Davidson Trucking, Inc.. (Luke, K)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 JOINDER in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Darrell Brown Trucking Inc. (Lehman, Thomas) Modified on 9/24/2021 (KEK).
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 JOINDER in re #89 , #86 , #85 , 87 IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND filed by Abramson LLC. (Perdue, Howard)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 JOINDER in re #90 , #91 , #89 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Peterson Contractors Inc. (Ronnlund, Robert)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 JOINDER in re #90 , #91 , #89 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Sweeping Corporation of America Inc. (Partridge, Donald)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 JOINDER in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Alabama Guardrail Inc. (Cobb, Christopher)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 JOINDER in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Penhall Company Inc. (McAlister, David)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 RESPONSE in Opposition re #79 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Synergy Earth Systems LLC. (Strubel, J)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 RESPONSE in Opposition re #79 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Daystar Enterprises LLC. (Moss, James)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 JOINDER in re #90 , #91 , #89 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Mill It Up LLC. (Barze, R)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 RESPONSE in Opposition re #79 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Tortorigi Construction Inc. (Gilmore, William)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 RESPONSE in Opposition re #79 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Russo Corporation. (Griffith, Jonathan)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 RESPONSE in Opposition re #79 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Volkert Inc. (Sinor, Andrew)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 RESPONSE in Opposition re #79 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Granite Construction Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 2 D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 2 E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 2 F, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 2 G, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 2 H, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 7 A, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 7 B, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 7 C, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 9)(Gault, Edwin)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles McGuffey on behalf of Granite Construction Company Inc (McGuffey, Charles)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants defendant's unopposed motion to exceed page limitation. (Doc. #86 ). Granite's responsive brief shall not exceed 45 pages in length and Plaintiff's reply brief shall not exceed 30 pages in length. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/20/2021. (YMB)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Granite Construction Company Inc. (Upchurch, Caroline)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Mickey Jansen Voss on behalf of A-1 Sealing Inc (Voss, Mickey)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to plaintiff's #79 Motion to Remand. (Doc. #83 ). Defendants shall please file their response on or before 9/23/2021; plaintiff may file a reply on or before 9/30/2021. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/9/2021. (YMB)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Granite Construction Company Inc. (Upchurch, Caroline)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Axis Surplus Insurance Company. filed by Axis Surplus Insurance Company (Austill, William)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER. Judge Borden has issued the following order regarding the pending motion to remand in case 21-1039: Defendants are ORDERED to file a response to the motion on or before September 13, 2021. Any reply by Plaintiffs should be filed on or before September 20, 2021. The parties shall follow the same briefing schedule in this case. If a party wishes, it may adopt as its brief in this matter a brief filed in case 21-1039. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on August 30, 2021. (Haikala, Madeline)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Brief re #79 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Brief in Support of Motion to Remand) filed by Bonderia Lyons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22)(Leonard, Jeffrey)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Bonderia Lyons. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 JOINDER in re #1 Defendant Granite's Notice of Removal filed by Ross Tortorigi Inc. (Bolvig, C)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint, by Abramson LLC.(Perdue, Howard)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE by Volkert Inc Consent to Granite Construction Company, Inc.'s Notice of Removal (Sinor, Andrew)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 JOINDER in Notice of Removal by Synergy Earth Systems LLC. (Strubel, J) Modified docket text on 8/24/2021 (KEK).
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 JOINDER in Notice of Removal by JEM Hardscapes LLC. (Gann, M) Modified docket text on 8/24/2021 (KEK).
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard G. Perdue, III on behalf of Abramson LLC (Perdue, Howard)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A-1 Sealing Inc. filed by A-1 Sealing Inc (Elliott, Edgar)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 JOINDER in Granite Construction, Inc.'s Notice of Removal by Peterson Contractors Inc. (Ronnlund, Robert) Modified docket text on 8/23/2021 (KEK).
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, by Thomas Land Clearing & Construction Inc.(Ronnlund, Robert)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, by Peterson Contractors Inc.(Ronnlund, Robert)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 JOINDER in re #1 Defendant Granite's Notice of Removal by Tortorigi Construction Inc. (Gilmore, William) Modified docket text on 8/23/2021 (KEK).
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint, by Russo Corporation.(Griffith, Jonathan)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sweeping Corporation of America Inc. filed by Sweeping Corporation of America Inc (Partridge, Donald)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 JOINDER in re #1 Defendant Granite's Notice of Removal filed by Daystar Enterprises LLC. (Moss, James)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 JOINDER in Granite Construction Company, Inc.'s Notice of Removal by Russo Corporation. (Macoy, Cecil) Modified docket text on 8/23/2021 (KEK).
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 TEXT ORDER: Granite Construction Company has requested that the Court continue the deadlines for the Rule 26(f) report and initial disclosures. This request is unopposed. The Court therefore grants the request. The deadlines are stayed until the pending motion for consolidation is resolved. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 8/20/2021. (KEK)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Albert Griffith on behalf of Russo Corporation (Griffith, Jonathan)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Albert Griffith on behalf of Russo Corporation (Griffith, Jonathan)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Penhall Company Inc. filed by Penhall Company Inc (McAlister, David)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint, by Penhall Company Inc.(McAlister, David)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 JOINDER in Granite Construction Company's Notice of Removal filed by Penhall Company Inc. (McAlister, David)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 JOINDER in Granite Construction Company, Inc's Notice of Removal by Mill It Up LLC. (Barze, R) Modified docket text on 8/23/2021 (KEK).
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Amended ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint by Mill It Up LLC. (Barze, R)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Granite Construction Company Inc. (Upchurch, Caroline)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thomas Land Clearing & Construction Inc. filed by Thomas Land Clearing & Construction Inc (Ronnlund, Robert)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Peterson Contractors Inc. filed by Peterson Contractors Inc (Ronnlund, Robert)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ross Tortorigi Inc. filed by Ross Tortorigi Inc (Bolvig, C)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 AMENDED ANSWER to Fourth Amended Complaint by Tortorigi Construction Inc. (Gilmore, William)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alabama Guardrail Inc. filed by Alabama Guardrail Inc (Gray, James)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, by Alabama Guardrail Inc.(Gray, James)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mill It Up LLC. filed by Mill It Up LLC (Barze, R)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Russo Corporation. filed by Russo Corporation (Macoy, Cecil)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Daystar Enterprises LLC (Moss, James)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Darrell Brown Trucking Inc. filed by Darrell Brown Trucking Inc (Lehman, Thomas)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JEM Hardscapes LLC. filed by JEM Hardscapes LLC (Gann, M)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Volkert Inc (Sinor, Andrew)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Synergy Earth Systems LLC. filed by Synergy Earth Systems LLC (Strubel, J)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Amended ANSWER to Complaint (Fourth Amended) by Synergy Earth Systems LLC.(Strubel, J)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tortorigi Construction Inc. filed by Tortorigi Construction Inc (Gilmore, William)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nichols Concrete Equipment Company Inc. filed by Nichols Concrete Equipment Company Inc (Wilson, David)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Amended ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Fourth Amendment to Complaint by Nichols Concrete Equipment Company Inc.(Wilson, David)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint, Amended Complaint , ANSWER to Amended Complaint, Amended Complaint by Ross Tortorigi Inc.(Bolvig, C)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Davidson Trucking, Inc.. filed by Davidson Trucking, Inc. (Luke, K)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Daystar Enterprises LLC.(Moss, James)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M Ronnlund on behalf of Peterson Contractors Inc, Thomas Land Clearing & Construction Inc (Ronnlund, Robert)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Amended ANSWER to Complaint by JEM Hardscapes LLC.(Gann, M)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Granite Construction Company Inc (Gault, Edwin)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by David M Wilson on behalf of Nichols Concrete Equipment Company Inc (Wilson, David)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by William A Austill on behalf of Axis Surplus Insurance Company (Austill, William)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Davidson Trucking, Inc..(Luke, K)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip R Collins on behalf of JEM Hardscapes LLC (Collins, Philip)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by M Keith Gann on behalf of JEM Hardscapes LLC (Gann, M)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter S Hayes on behalf of Tortorigi Construction Inc (Hayes, Walter)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Montgomery on behalf of Alabama Guardrail Inc (Montgomery, Michael)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey P Leonard on behalf of Bonderia Lyons (Leonard, Jeffrey)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 HAIKALA CHAMBERS INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 7/30/2021. (KAM)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Emily Van Uden Monroe on behalf of Mill It Up LLC (Monroe, Mary Emily)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by R Bruce Barze, Jr on behalf of Mill It Up LLC (Barze, R)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Jeffery Lehman on behalf of Darrell Brown Trucking Inc (Lehman, Thomas)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel T Sessions on behalf of Russo Corporation (Sessions, Samuel)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Cecil H Macoy, Jr on behalf of Russo Corporation (Macoy, Cecil)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by William Ivey Gilmore, Jr on behalf of Tortorigi Construction Inc (Gilmore, William)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey R. Reckart on behalf of Daystar Enterprises LLC (Reckart, Kelsey)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by James W Moss on behalf of Daystar Enterprises LLC (Moss, James)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James S Witcher, III on behalf of Volkert Inc (Witcher, James)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David L McAlister on behalf of Penhall Company Inc (McAlister, David)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Crank Scarpetta on behalf of Synergy Earth Systems LLC (Scarpetta, Ashley)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by J Patrick Strubel on behalf of Synergy Earth Systems LLC (Strubel, J)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Edgar M Elliott, IV on behalf of A-1 Sealing Inc (Elliott, Edgar)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J Sinor, Jr on behalf of Volkert Inc (Sinor, Andrew)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald C Partridge on behalf of Sweeping Corporation of America Inc (Partridge, Donald)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D Cobb on behalf of Granite Construction Company Inc (Cobb, Christopher)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James C Gray, III on behalf of Granite Construction Company Inc (Gray, James)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by K Phillip Luke on behalf of Davidson Trucking, Inc. (Luke, K)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE by Granite Construction Company Inc State Court Docket (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket, #2 State Court Docket, #3 State Court Docket, #4 State Court Docket, #5 State Court Docket, #6 State Court Docket, #7 State Court Docket, #8 State Court Docket, #9 State Court Docket, #10 State Court Docket, #11 State Court Docket, #12 State Court Docket, #13 State Court Docket, #14 State Court Docket, #15 State Court Docket, #16 State Court Docket, #17 State Court Docket, #18 State Court Docket, #19 State Court Docket, #20 State Court Docket, #21 State Court Docket, #22 State Court Docket, #23 State Court Docket, #24 State Court Docket, #25 State Court Docket, #26 State Court Docket, #27 State Court Docket, #28 State Court Docket, #29 State Court Docket, #30 State Court Docket, #31 State Court Docket, #32 State Court Docket, #33 State Court Docket, #34 State Court Docket, #35 State Court Docket, #36 State Court Docket, #37 State Court Docket, #38 State Court Docket, #39 State Court Docket, #40 State Court Docket, #41 State Court Docket, #42 State Court Docket, #43 State Court Docket, #44 State Court Docket, #45 State Court Docket, #46 State Court Docket, #47 State Court Docket, #48 State Court Docket)(Gault, Edwin)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3893797. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Bonderia Lyons, filed by Granite Construction Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(KAM). (Gault, Edwin)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Daystar Enterprises LLC. (deemed filed 10/18/2018 in state court)(KAM)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Abramson LLC. (deemed filed 9/10/18 in state court)(KAM)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants (deemed filed on 8/3/2018 in state court adding defendants Daystar Enterprises LLC and Darrell Brown Trucking Inc).(KAM)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ANSWER to Complaint by Tortorigi Construction Inc. (deemed filed in state court on 10/1/2018)(KAM)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ANSWER to Complaint by Russo Corporation. (deemed filed on 9/28/2018 in state court)(KAM)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ANSWER to Complaint by Volkert Inc. (deemed filed 10/17/2018 in state court)(KAM)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Granite Construction Company Inc. (deemed filed on 11/21/2018 in state court)(KAM)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint, by Granite Construction Company Inc. (deemed filed in sate court on 11/27/2018)(KAM)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order AMENDED COMPLAINT adding defendants A-1 Sealing Inc, Alabama Guardrail Inc, Mill It Up LLC, Penhall Company Inc, Peterson Contractors Inc, Ross Tortorigi Inc, Sweeping Corporation of America Inc,Synergy Earth Systems LLC, Thomas Land Clearing Company Inc (deemed filed 10/18/2018 in state court).(KAM)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Abramson LLC. (deemed filed 10/18/2018 in state court)(KAM)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Bonderia Lyon by Granite Construction Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyons v. Granite Construction Company Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonderia Lyons
Represented By: Amanda S Williamson
Represented By: Jeanie Snipes Sleadd
Represented By: Jeffrey P Leonard
Represented By: Stephen D Heninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite Construction Company Inc
Represented By: Caroline M Upchurch
Represented By: Edwin S Gault, Jr
Represented By: James C Gray, III
Represented By: Charles McGuffey
Represented By: Christopher D Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkert Inc
Represented By: Andrew J Sinor, Jr
Represented By: James S Witcher, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russo Corporation
Represented By: G Thomas Sullivan
Represented By: Cecil H Macoy, Jr
Represented By: Jonathan Albert Griffith
Represented By: Samuel T Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tortorigi Construction Inc
Represented By: Walter S Hayes
Represented By: Laura J Crissey
Represented By: William Ivey Gilmore, Jr
Represented By: Wilson Franklin Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abramson LLC
Represented By: Howard G. Perdue, III
Represented By: Joseph R Duncan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A G Peltz Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daystar Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Kelsey R. Reckart
Represented By: James W Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Brown Trucking Inc
Represented By: Thomas Jeffery Lehman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-1 Sealing Inc
Represented By: Edgar M Elliott, IV
Represented By: Mickey Jansen Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Guardrail Inc
Represented By: Michael A Montgomery
Represented By: James C Gray, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mill It Up LLC
Represented By: Mary Emily Van Uden Monroe
Represented By: R Bruce Barze, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penhall Company Inc
Represented By: David L McAlister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peterson Contractors Inc
Represented By: Robert M Ronnlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Tortorigi Inc
Represented By: C Peter Bolvig, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweeping Corporation of America Inc
Represented By: Donald C Partridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synergy Earth Systems LLC
Represented By: Emily Hill Walters
Represented By: J Patrick Strubel
Represented By: Ashley Crank Scarpetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Land Clearing & Construction Inc doing business as Thomas Land Clearing Company
Represented By: Robert M Ronnlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davidson Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: K Phillip Luke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEM Hardscapes LLC
Represented By: M Keith Gann
Represented By: Philip R Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nichols Concrete Equipment Company Inc
Represented By: David M Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Axis Surplus Insurance Company
Represented By: William A Austill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?