Noles v. Airlite Plastics Co
Plaintiff: Christopher Noles
Defendant: Airlite Plastics Co
Case Number: 2:2021cv01043
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Airlite Plastics Co, filed by Christopher Noles.(Riley, Kenneth)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - On or before October 4, 2021, Mr. Noles shall either correct the jurisdictional deficiency in his complaint or show cause in writing why the Court should not dismiss this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/20/2021. (KEK)
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT- The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Madeline Hughes Haikala. Please use case number 2:21 CV 1043 MHH on all subsequent pleadings. (AKD)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER setting motion deadline re #7 Motion for Protective Order. Any opposition is due by September 15, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/8/2021. (CDG)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 09/01/2021. (AKD)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than October 12, 2021. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after October 12, 2021. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for September 27, 2021 at 10:15 a.m.. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 09/01/2021. (AKD)
September 1, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Protective Order Motion is RIPE 9/1/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Airlite Plastics Co. (Bains, Jack)
August 27, 2021 Filing 6 Airlite Plastics ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Airlite Plastics Co.(Bains, Jack)
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Noles. Airlite Plastics Co served on 8/3/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (AKD)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Airlite Plastics Co. Mailed certified mail. (AKD)
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Christopher Noles. (AKD)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Airlite Plastics Co, filed by Christopher Noles.(AKD)
July 29, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3894283 (ALND receipt# B4601114895). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Airlite Plastics Co, filed by Christopher Noles.(AKD). (Riley, Kenneth) Modified on 7/29/2021 (AKD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noles v. Airlite Plastics Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Noles
Represented By: Kenneth E Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airlite Plastics Co
Represented By: Jack M Bains, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?