Miller v. Combe Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: John Miller
Defendant: Combe International LLC, Combe Incorporated, Combe Products Inc, Combe Laboratories Inc and Combe International LTD
Case Number: 2:2021cv01079
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal; costs taxed as paid. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 09/16/2021. (AKD)
September 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Miller (Hardenstein, Taylor)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action (AKD)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Combe Incorporated, Combe International LLC, Combe Laboratories Inc, Combe Products Inc, filed by John Miller.(AKD)
August 6, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3899302 (ALND receipt# B4601115060). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Combe Incorporated, Combe International LLC, Combe Laboratories Inc, Combe Products Inc, filed by John Miller.(AKD). (Hardenstein, Taylor) Modified on 8/6/2021 (AKD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Combe Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe International LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe Laboratories Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe International LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Miller
Represented By: Taylor Stanton Hardenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?