Cash v. US Department of Housing and Urban Development et al
Plaintiff: Don Cash
Defendant: US Department of Housing and Urban Development, Marcia Fudge, David Northern, Larry Davis, Vorncella Hooks, Steve Davis, Integral Property Management LLC, Egbert LJ Perry and John Dunnam
Case Number: 2:2021cv01175
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by John Dunnam, Integral Property Management LLC, Egbert LJ Perry. (Tyra, Bryan)
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Don Cash. (KAM)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: re #5 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants John Dunnam, Integral Property Management LLC, and Egbert LJ Perry. Plaintiff is ORDERED file a response to the motion on or before October 13, 2021, and John Dunnam, Integral Property Management LLC, and Egbert LJ Perry may file a reply on or before October 20, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 9/29/2021. (JGB)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by John Dunnam, Integral Property Management LLC, Egbert LJ Perry. (Tyra, Bryan)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER #1 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 9/21/2021. (KAM)
August 27, 2021 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Don Cash. (within the body of the complaint) (KAM)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John Dunnam, Integral Property Management LLC, Egbert LJ Perry. delivered to plaintiff for service (KAM)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Larry Davis, Steve Davis, Marcia Fudge, Vorncella Hooks, David Northern, US Department of Housing and Urban Development, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General delivered to plaintiff for service (KAM)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Larry Davis, Steve Davis, John Dunnam, Marcia Fudge, Vorncella Hooks, Integral Property Management LLC, David Northern, Egbert LJ Perry, US Department of Housing and Urban Development (Filing fee $ 402. rec# B4601115433), filed by Don Cash.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cash v. US Department of Housing and Urban Development et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Cash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Housing and Urban Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia Fudge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Northern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vorncella Hooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integral Property Management LLC
Represented By: Bryan Scott Tyra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Egbert LJ Perry
Represented By: Bryan Scott Tyra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Dunnam
Represented By: Bryan Scott Tyra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?