Wise v. Publix Super Markets Inc
Plaintiff: Yolanda Wise
Defendant: Publix Super Markets Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv01183
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Protective Order Motion is RIPE 10/22/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Publix Super Markets Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed HIPAA Order)(Keith, Travis)
October 21, 2021 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Keith, Travis)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/18/2021. (BST, )
October 18, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. The status conference set for October 18, 2021 is CANCELLED(MRR, ) Modified to correct attachment on 10/18/2021 (MRR, ).
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Yolanda Wise; Attorney Harrison Royster Jones terminated; the status conference set for 10/27/21 is cancelled, however the telephone conference set for Monday 10/18/21 regarding consent remains scheduled unless all parties submit their consent forms; Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/15/2021. (BST, )
October 14, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE to remind parties of consent telephone conference scheduled for 11:00 AM on Monday, 10/18/21; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, the conference will be cancelled. (BST, )
October 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Constantin Post on behalf of Yolanda Wise (Post, Constantin)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: In light of the motion to withdraw filed by counsel for the plaintiff, this matter is SET for a telephone status conference at 11:00 a.m. on October 27, 2021. The status conference will be cancelled by separate order if other counsel appears on behalf of the plaintiff. The parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1831 to join the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/12/21. (MRR, )
October 6, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion is RIPE 10/6/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Yolanda Wise. (Jones, Harrison)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than November 15, 2021. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after November 15, 2021. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 11:00 a.m. on October 18, 2021. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/30/21. (MRR, )
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/4/2021; Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/30/2021. (BST, )
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Publix Super Markets Inc.(Keith, Travis)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- The defendant has not answered or otherwise responded to the complaint. The plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE, within ten calendar days, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/28/21. (MRR, )
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Publix Super Markets Inc. filed by Publix Super Markets Inc (Keith, Travis)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Publix Super Markets Inc from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2021-902106, filed by Publix Super Markets Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(KEK)
August 27, 2021 State court complaint filed 7/22/2021 by Plaintiff Yolanda Wise against Publix Super Markets Inc. See Doc #1 , Exhibit A. (KEK)
August 27, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3914248 (B4601115466). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Publix Super Markets Inc from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2021-902106, filed by Publix Super Markets Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(KEK). (Keith, Travis) Modified on 8/30/2021 (MRR, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wise v. Publix Super Markets Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Wise
Represented By: Harrison Royster Jones
Represented By: Constantin Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Publix Super Markets Inc
Represented By: Travis Ian Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?