Smith v. Yum Restaurant Services Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Elderick O Smith
Defendant: Yum Restaurant Services Group LLC and Davis House No 1 Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv01219
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Anderson, Andrew) Modified text on 11/3/2021 (AKD).
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Because the removing defendant has not identified its members or alleged their citizenships, it has failed to sufficiently allege its citizenship. Yum Restaurant is ORDERED to amend its notice of removal within fourteen (14) calendar days from the entry date of this order, to correct the deficiencies in the jurisdictional allegations discussed above. The amended notice of removal SHALL be complete and not incorporate by reference or refer back to a previously filed document. For the same reasons, the motion to substitute is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Doc. #4 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/20/2021. (KEK)
October 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Substitute Party Motion is RIPE 10/12/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Yum Restaurant Services Group LLC. (Anderson, Andrew)
September 15, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number B4601115788 (MRR, )
September 13, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Yum Restaurant Services Group LLC.(Anderson, Andrew)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 68-cv-2021-900391., filed by Yum Restaurant Services Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(MRR, )
September 9, 2021 COMPLAINT against Davis House No 1 Inc, Yum Restaurant Services Group LLC, filed by Elderick O Smith.-Deemed filed 7/28/21, Circuit Court of Jefferson County (Doc 1-2 p.14 of combined pdf)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Yum Restaurant Services Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elderick O Smith
Represented By: Garrett Parker Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yum Restaurant Services Group LLC
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Anderson
Represented By: Thomas L Oliver, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis House No 1 Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?