Goodner v. Ramsey Trucking Inc et al
Plaintiff: Robert Goodner
Defendant: Ramsey Trucking Inc and Patrick Hyde
Case Number: 2:2021cv01306
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER transferring case to the District of Maryland; original electronic record and certified copy of docket entries will be sent electronically to Clerk of Court 10 business days from this date. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 11/10/2021. (AKD)
November 10, 2021 Filing 9 REPLY to re #6 In Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Patrick Hyde, Ramsey Trucking Inc. (Isenberg, Joel)
November 3, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ramsey Trucking Inc. filed by Ramsey Trucking Inc (Isenberg, Joel)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 MOTION to Change Venue- Based on the allegations in the complaint, the motion is well founded and should be granted. To the extent the plaintiff disagrees, his response is due on November 5, 2021, and defendants' reply, if any, is due on November 10, 2021. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 10/26/2021. (AKD)
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Change Venue by Patrick Hyde, Ramsey Trucking Inc. (Isenberg, Joel)
October 19, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Goodner. Patrick Hyde served on 10/18/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (AKD)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Goodner. Ramsey Trucking Inc served on 10/8/2021, answer due 10/29/2021 (no date on green card). (AKD)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Patrick Hyde and Ramsey Trucking Inc. Mailed certified mail. (AKD)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Robert Goodner. (Farris, Kirby)
September 30, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3935472 (ALND reciept# B4601116079. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Patrick Hyde, Ramsey Trucking Inc, filed by Robert Goodner.(AKD). (Farris, Kirby) Modified on 9/30/2021 (AKD).
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Patrick Hyde, Ramsey Trucking Inc, filed by Robert Goodner.(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodner v. Ramsey Trucking Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Goodner
Represented By: Kirby D Farris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramsey Trucking Inc
Represented By: A Mark Bahakel
Represented By: Joel S Isenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Hyde
Represented By: A Mark Bahakel
Represented By: Joel S Isenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?