Fleming v. Boyd et al
Plaintiff: Countess Fleming
Defendant: Andrew C Boyd and Cowboy Transportation Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv01308
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER - No causes of action, defenses, or parties may be added after January 7, 2022 as to plaintiff and February 4, 2022 as to defendants. All discovery must be commenced in time to be completed by July 29, 2022. All potentially dispositive motions must be filed no later than August 31, 2022. A pretrial conference will be scheduled in a separate order after the deadline for dispositive motions. The parties shall be ready for trial on or before October 24, 2022, to be scheduled by separate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 11/22/2021. (KEK)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 11/19/2021. (AKD)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 11/19/2021. (AKD)
November 19, 2021 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge (AKD)
November 19, 2021 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Stewart, Taffi)
November 19, 2021 NOTICE: The telephone Conference set for November 22, 2021 is CANCELLED. (AKD)
November 18, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kayla Michelle Wunderlich on behalf of Andrew C Boyd, Cowboy Transportation Services Inc (Wunderlich, Kayla)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCEWITH RULE 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/29/2021. (AKD)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than December 10, 2021. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after December 10, 2021. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for November 22, 2021 at 10:20 a.m.. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/29/2021. (AKD)
October 26, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Andrew C Boyd, Cowboy Transportation Services Inc. filed by Andrew C Boyd, Cowboy Transportation Services Inc (Stewart, Taffi)
October 26, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Andrew C Boyd, Cowboy Transportation Services Inc.(Stewart, Taffi)
October 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by E Britton Monroe on behalf of Andrew C Boyd, Cowboy Transportation Services Inc (Monroe, E)
October 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Taffi S Stewart on behalf of Andrew C Boyd, Cowboy Transportation Services Inc (Stewart, Taffi)
October 8, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Countess Fleming. Cowboy Transportation Services Inc served on 10/5/2021, answer due 10/26/2021. (AKD)
October 6, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Countess Fleming. Andrew C Boyd served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021 (no date or signature on green card). (AKD)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew C Boyd and Cowboy Transportation Services Inc. Mailed certified mail. (AKD)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Conflict Disclosure by Countess Fleming (AKD)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew C Boyd, Cowboy Transportation Services Inc, filed by Countess Fleming.(AKD)
September 30, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3935057 (ALND receipt#b4601116058). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Andrew C Boyd, Cowboy Transportation Services Inc, filed by Countess Fleming.(AKD). (Riley, Kenneth) Modified on 9/30/2021 (AKD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleming v. Boyd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Countess Fleming
Represented By: Kenneth E Riley
Represented By: Meredith Kay Maitrejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew C Boyd
Represented By: Taffi S Stewart
Represented By: Kayla Michelle Wunderlich
Represented By: E Britton Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowboy Transportation Services Inc
Represented By: E Britton Monroe
Represented By: Taffi S Stewart
Represented By: Kayla Michelle Wunderlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?