Burgess v. American Lumber Inc
Plaintiff: Deshawn Burgess
Defendant: American Lumber Inc and American Trade Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01319
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Leave To File Response Out Of Time Or Alternatively, Motion for Extension of Time Motion is RIPE 11/19/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by American Lumber Inc. (Dettling, Ethan)
November 19, 2021 Filing 21 Defendant's RESPONSE to Motion to Remand by American Lumber Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Dettling, Ethan) Modified on 11/19/2021 (AKD).
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER setting motion deadline #19 Motion for Sanctions. Defendants' response is due by December 1, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 11/17/2021. (CDG)
November 17, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Sanctions by Deshawn Burgess. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Williams, D)
November 16, 2021 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to American Trade Group, Inc. Mailed certified mail. (AKD)
November 11, 2021 Filing 17 Request for service by certified mail filed by Deshawn Burgess. (Williams, D)
November 11, 2021 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against American Trade Group, Inc. and American Lumber Inc., filed by Deshawn Burgess.(Williams, D) Modified text on 11/12/2021 (AKD).
November 8, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number B4601116821 (AKD)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 11/01/2021. (AKD)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than December 13, 2021. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after December 13, 2021. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for November 30, 2021 at 10:45 a.m.. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 11/01/2021. (AKD)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER setting briefing schedule re #12 Motion to Remand. Defendants' response is due by November 12, 2021. Plaintiff's reply, if any, is due by November 19, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 10/29/2021. (CDG)
October 29, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by Deshawn Burgess. (Williams, D)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Discovery, consistent with the previous order granting Plaintiff's motion for expedited discovery as unopposed. Defendant's responses to Plaintiff's discovery requests are due by November 8, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 10/22/2021. (CDG)
October 21, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Discovery Motion to Shorten Time for Defendant to Respond to Discovery by Deshawn Burgess. (Williams, D)
October 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie M Hand on behalf of American Lumber Inc (Hand, Leslie)
October 18, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by American Lumber Inc.(Peddy, A)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Discovery as unopposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 10/18/2021. (CDG)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER setting motion deadline re #5 Motion for Discovery. Any opposition is due by October 15, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 10/12/2021. (CDG)
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Expedited Discovery by Deshawn Burgess. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Williams, D)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Trade Group, Inc., filed by Deshawn Burgess.(Williams, D)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Lumber Inc. filed by American Lumber Inc (Dettling, Ethan)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Lumber Inc from Circuit Court of Jefferson County Alabama, case number 01-CV-2021-902529.00. filed by American Lumber Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgess v. American Lumber Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deshawn Burgess
Represented By: D Blake Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Lumber Inc
Represented By: Ethan R Dettling
Represented By: A Joe Peddy
Represented By: Leslie M Hand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Trade Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?