White v. Lyft Inc et al
Plaintiff: James White
Defendant: Lyft Inc and William Robertson
Case Number: 2:2021cv01362
Filed: October 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff James White and Defendant Lyft, Inc.'s #12 joint motion for extension of time to file an answer to the #9 amended complaint. Lyft's answer is now due on or before December 15, 2021. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 11/19/2021. (RLW)
November 18, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Lyft Inc. (Niemeyer, Michael)
November 18, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C Niemeyer on behalf of Lyft Inc (Niemeyer, Michael)
November 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C Niemeyer on behalf of Lyft Inc (Niemeyer, Michael)
November 1, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lyft Inc, William Robertson, filed by James White.(Farris, Kirby)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER finding as moot Plaintiff James White's #6 motion to amend his complaint. Because Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(A) permits Mr. White to file the amended complaint as a matter of right, he does not need the court's permission to amend the complaint. If Mr. White wishes to file the amended complaint, he must file it separately on the docket. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 11/1/2021. (RLW)
November 1, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by James White as to William Robertson. (KEK)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 Order to Show Cause, #2 Order to Show Cause, by James White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Exemplar Complaint)(Farris, Kirby)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The court ORDERS Mr. White to SHOW CAUSE, in writing, on or before November 8, 2021, why the court should not dismiss this action for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with the court's order. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 11/1/2021. (KEK)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James White. Lyft Inc served on 10/25/2021, answer due 11/15/2021. (KEK)
October 21, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lyft Inc, William Robertson. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - To establish the court's subject matter jurisdiction, Mr. White must also allege Lyft's principal place of business. The court therefore ORDERS Mr. White to SHOW CAUSE, in writing, on or before October 29, 2021, why the court should not dismiss this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 10/15/2021. (KEK)
October 14, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3943153. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Lyft Inc, William Robertson, filed by James White.(KEK). (Farris, Kirby)
October 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lyft Inc, William Robertson, filed by James White.(KEK)
October 13, 2021 Request for service by certified mail filed within complaint. (KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Lyft Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James White
Represented By: Kirby D Farris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyft Inc
Represented By: Michael C Niemeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?