Williams v. Home City Ice Co et al
Plaintiff: Pamala Williams
Defendant: Home City Ice Co and Eugene Curtis Mayo, II
Case Number: 2:2021cv01381
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCEWITH RULE 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 12/02/2021. (AKD)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than January 14, 2022. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after January 14, 2022. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for December 30, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 12/02/2021. (AKD)
December 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie M Hand on behalf of Home City Ice Co, Eugene Curtis Mayo, II (Hand, Leslie)
December 1, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Home City Ice Co, Eugene Curtis Mayo, II.(Peddy, A)
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamala Williams. Eugene Curtis Mayo, II served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Lowery, Courtney)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamala Williams. Home City Ice Co served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021. (Lowery, Courtney)
October 25, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Home City Ice Co, Eugene Curtis Mayo, II. Delivered to Plaintiff for service. (AKD)
October 18, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD)
October 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Home City Ice Co and Eugene Curtis Mayo, II, filed by Pamala Williams.(AKD)
October 18, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3945249 (ALND Receipt# B4601116429). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Home City Ice Co and Eugene Curtis Mayo, II, filed by Pamala Williams.(AKD). (Lowery, Courtney) Modified on 10/18/2021 (AKD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Home City Ice Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamala Williams
Represented By: Courtney Elizabeth Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home City Ice Co
Represented By: A Joe Peddy
Represented By: Leslie M Hand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Curtis Mayo, II
Represented By: A Joe Peddy
Represented By: Leslie M Hand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?