Gardiner v. RoundPoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Robert M Gardiner
Defendant: RoundPoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation, Federal National Mortgage Association and Electronic Registration Systems Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv01397
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Filing 12 Brief re #6 MOTION for Permanent Injunction against state court proceedings Supplement re: stay of appeal filed by Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Federal National Mortgage Association, RoundPoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Errata Ex. 1: Notice of stay)(Reeves, T)
December 17, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Federal National Mortgage Association, RoundPoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1: State court docket)(Reeves, T)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: The Court cancels the Telephonic Motions Hearing currently set for 12/2/2021 and resets the hearing for Monday, 12/20/2021 at 11:00 AM. Counsel shall please dial 877-873-8018 and enter access code 5313999 to participate in the hearing. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 12/1/2021. (YMB)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Before the Court are Defendants' motion to enjoin state court proceedings, (Doc. #6 ), Plaintiff's motion to remand, (Doc. #7 ), and Plaintiff's motion to stay, (Doc. #8 ). The Court sets these matters for a telephone conference at 1:30 p.m. CST on December 2, 2021. Counsel of record shall please dial 877-873-8018 and enter access code 5313999 to participate in the call. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 11/24/2201. (KEK)
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay case and deadlines by Robert M Gardiner. (Lay, Kenneth)
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Robert M Gardiner. (Lay, Kenneth)
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Permanent Injunction against state court proceedings by Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Federal National Mortgage Association, RoundPoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: State court notice 68-cv-2019-900066, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2: State court notice 68-cv-2021-000046, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3: Gardiner's Motion to Alter, Amend, or Vacate, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4: Order setting hearing on Gardiner's Motion to Alter, Amend, or Vacate, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5: Gardiner's Notice of Appeal and/or Mandamus Relief)(Reeves, T)
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Federal National Mortgage Association Notice of Pending Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion for More Definite Statement)(Reeves, T)
October 28, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3952442. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal National Mortgage Association, RoundPoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation, Electronic Registration Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, part 1, # 4 Exhibit 3, part 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, part 3)(KEK). (Reeves, T)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 HAIKALA CHAMBERS INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 10/25/2021. (KEK)
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 Evidentiary Material re: #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit 4 to Notice of Removal. (Reeves, T)
October 20, 2021 Filing 2 RoundPoint's ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Robert M Gardiner by RoundPoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1: Mortgage, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2: Assignment of Mortgage, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3: Notice of Default, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4: Notice of Acceleration)(Reeves, T)
October 20, 2021 ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM filed 3/18/2019 by Robert M Gardiner. Severed in state court and converted to complaint. *See Doc #1 , Exhibit 3, part 1, pages 115-136* (KEK)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER SEVERING CLAIMS filed 10/15/2021 in state court. *See Doc #1 , Exhibit 3, part 3, page 46* (KEK)
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal National Mortgage Association, RoundPoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation, Electronic Registration Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, part 1, #4 Exhibit 3, part 2, #5 Exhibit 3, part 3)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardiner v. RoundPoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert M Gardiner
Represented By: Kenneth J Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RoundPoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation
Represented By: Shaun K Ramey
Represented By: T Dylan Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Shaun K Ramey
Represented By: T Dylan Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Registration Systems Inc
Represented By: Shaun K Ramey
Represented By: T Dylan Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?