DC Injury Solutions LLC v. Morris Bart LLC et al
Plaintiff: DC Injury Solutions LLC doing business as Injury Solution, The
Defendant: Morris Bart LLC and Morris Bart
Case Number: 2:2021cv01461
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by DC Injury Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit Exhibit "C")(Post, Constantin)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge after 1/28/2022 unless they unanimously consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge; Telephone Conference set for 1/19/2022 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden; parties to call in as directed; if all parties submit an executed consent before 1/19/2022, the telephone conference will be cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 12/16/2021. (KAM)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: re #5 Motion to Dismiss filed by Morris Bart, LLC. Plaintiff is ORDERED file a response to the motion on or before December 28, 2021, and Defendant may file a reply on or before January 4, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 12/14/2021. (JGB)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Morris Bart LLC. filed by Morris Bart LLC (Hamilton, Charles)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Morris Bart, Morris Bart LLC. (Hamilton, Charles)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DC Injury Solutions LLC. Morris Bart served on 11/29/2021, answer due 12/20/2021; Morris Bart LLC served on 11/29/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (KAM)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Morris Bart, Morris Bart LLC. mailed certified mail (KAM)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3959183. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Morris Bart, Morris Bart LLC, filed by DC Injury Solutions LLC.(KAM). (Post, Constantin) NDAL rec# B4601116852 Modified on 11/10/2021 (KAM).
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by DC Injury Solutions LLC. (Post, Constantin)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Morris Bart, Morris Bart LLC, filed by DC Injury Solutions LLC.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DC Injury Solutions LLC v. Morris Bart LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DC Injury Solutions LLC doing business as Injury Solution, The
Represented By: Constantin Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Bart LLC
Represented By: Charles K Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Bart
Represented By: Charles K Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?