Crews v. Pfizer Drug Chantix et al
Plaintiff: Danny Crews
Defendant: Pfizer Drug Chantix, Pfizer Inc and Pfizer
Case Number: 2:2021cv01487
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO AMEND-Accordingly, Mr. Crews is ORDERED to file an amended complaint within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file an amended complaint consistent with this order may result in dismissal of Mr. Crews's claims without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 01/05/2022. (AKD)
December 13, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE to #4 Order to Show Cause filed by Danny Crews. (AKD)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION AND TO SHOW CAUSE-Accordingly, Mr. Crews is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing within 14 calendar days as to why this matter should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction or, alternatively, improper venue. For reasons set out herein the motion to appoint an attorney is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE #2 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 12/02/2021. (AKD)
November 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 11/8/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Danny Crews. (AKD)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pfizer, Pfizer Drug Chantix, Pfizer Inc, filed by Danny Crews.(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crews v. Pfizer Drug Chantix et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Crews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Drug Chantix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?