Stedman v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: David P Stedman
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv01541
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Cobb, Amanda)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS reminding parties of their obligations under FRCP26(f) - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 1/11/2022. (KSS)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2023 11:15 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Jury Trial set for 8/28/2023 09:00 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Parties shall submit a report of the parties' planning meeding by 3/7/2022. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 1/10/2022. (KAM)
January 7, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by David P Stedman. filed by David P Stedman (McKay, Travis)
January 3, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Cobb, Amanda)
December 17, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David P Stedman. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company served on 12/13/2021, answer due 1/3/2022. (AKD)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Delivered to plaintiff for service. (AKD)
November 29, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number B4601117121 (AKD)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by David P Stedman.(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stedman v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David P Stedman
Represented By: Travis G McKay, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Amanda R. Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?