Moore v. United States of America
Petitioner: Diontez Jamel Moore
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv08009
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response and the court hereby gives the Government until on or before July 16, 2021 to respond to the court's #3 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 5/13/2021. (JLC)
May 11, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 2255 by United States of America. (Holt, Elizabeth)
April 20, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Anne Holt on behalf of United States of America (Holt, Elizabeth)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Movant Moore's 2255 Motion. Respondent has until May 17, 2021 to respond the court's #3 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 4/7/2021. (JLC)
April 7, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Moore's 2255 Motion by United States of America. (Billingsley, Michael)
April 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B Billingsley on behalf of United States of America (Billingsley, Michael)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; The court hereby ORDERS the Government to APPEAR and SHOW CAUSE in writing, on or before April 15, 2021, why the court should not grant the relief requested by Mr. Diontez Moore. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 3/24/2021. (JLC)
March 16, 2021 Filing 2 Memorandum of Law in Support #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). filed by Diontez Jamel Moore (JLC)
March 16, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), 2:17-cr-378-KOB, filed by Diontez Jamel Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Prim F. Escalona, US Attorney
Represented By: John B Felton
Represented By: Michael B Billingsley
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Diontez Jamel Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?