Chimaera-El v. United States of America
Petitioner: Hermes Chimaera-El
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv08014
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE to re #2 , #1 Chimaera-El's 2255 Motion filed by United States of America. (Billingsley, Michael)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of filing possible new mailing address: 1840 Enderly Drive, Columbus, OH 43219 by Hermes Chimaera-El.(KEK)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Hermes Chimaera-El (Doc 2). (KEK)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Hermes Chimaera-El. (MRR, )
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Hermes Chimaera-El. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MRR, )
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B Billingsley on behalf of United States of America (Billingsley, Michael)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Within 30 days from the date of this order, the United States shall state in writing whether it opposes Mr. Chimaera-El's motion and, if the United States opposes the motion, why the Court should not grant the relief that Mr. Chimaera-El requests. Mr. Chimaera-El may file a reply to the United States' response within 30 days of the date the response is filed. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 5/20/2021. (KEK)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Hermes Chimaera-El.(KEK) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2021: #1 Envelope) (KEK, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chimaera-El v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hermes Chimaera-El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Prim F. Escalona, US Attorney
Represented By: Nicole Grosnoff
Represented By: Michael B Billingsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?