Gilbert v. United States of America
Petitioner: Terran Marteze Gilbert
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv08018
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE in opposition to the Government's #4 Response to the Court's Order filed by Terran Marteze Gilbert. (AHI)
July 29, 2021 Filing 4 Opposition by the United States to Gilbert's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Atwood, Melissa) Modified on 7/29/2021 (AHI).
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Kay Atwood on behalf of United States of America (Atwood, Melissa)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - The Government is to Appear and SHOW CAUSE in writing by 7/30/2021, why the court should not grant the relief requested by the petition; Government is to furnish copies of any court records, briefs, transcripts, or other documents that may be pertinent to the matters discussed in its answer. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 7/9/2021. (AHI)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Terran Marteze Gilbert.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilbert v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terran Marteze Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Kristy Peoples
Represented By: Michael A Royster
Represented By: Thomas E Borton, IV
Represented By: Melissa Kay Atwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?