Cargill v. United States of America
Petitioner: Quincetta Y Cargill
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv08024
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 18 USCA Case Number 21-13962 for #12 Notice of Appeal filed by Quincetta Y Cargill. (KAM)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER #13 Motion for Recusal and #14 Motion for Certificate of Appealability are DENIED. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/16/2021. (KAM)
November 10, 2021 Filing 16 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #12 Notice of Appeal (KAM)
November 10, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of transmittal letter to the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals (KAM)
November 10, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by Quincetta Y Cargill. (KAM)
November 10, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Recusal by Quincetta Y Cargill. (KAM)
November 10, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Quincetta Y Cargill. (KAM)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - the Government's Motion to Dismiss as Premature Cargill's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence #6 is GRANTED; Cargill's Motion to Vacate #1 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Cargill's motions and requests for discovery #3 , #7 , #9 are ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/27/2021. (KAM)
October 25, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of potential conflict of interest by Quincetta Y Cargill (KAM)
October 22, 2021 Filing 9 Request for Rule 6 discovery by Quincetta Y Cargill (KAM)
October 22, 2021 Filing 8 Objection and Reply to to #6 Motion by the United States of America to dismiss as premature filed by Quincetta Y Cargill. (KAM)
October 18, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Discovery by Quincetta Y Cargill. (KAM)
October 15, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss as Premature by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Atwood, Melissa)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The United States is DIRECTED to appear and SHOW CAUSE in writing, within twenty (20) days from the date of this Order, why the relief requested by Petitioner should not be granted.. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/8/2021. (KAM)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER This action was commenced on September 30, 2021 with the filing of Petitioners Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody; On October 4, 2021, the court received an exact duplicate of this same Motion (Doc. #1) in the mail from Petitioner; Petitioner is ADVISED that the court will not be opening a new case with the Motion received on October 4, 2021. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/7/2021. (KAM)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Discovery by Quincetta Y Cargill. (KAM)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 Brief in support of #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Quincetta Y Cargill. (KAM)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) 2:17-cr-356-RDP, filed by Quincetta Y Cargill.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cargill v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Quincetta Y Cargill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Prim F. Escalona, US Attorney
Represented By: Allison Garnett
Represented By: John G Camp
Represented By: M Blake Milner
Represented By: Melissa Kay Atwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?