Crooks et al v. Murrows Transfer Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ruth Crooks and Wanda Malcolm
Defendant: Murrows Transfer Inc and Bradley Powell
Case Number: 2:2022cv00263
Filed: February 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Remand Letter sent to Jefferson County Circuit Court (AKD)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REMANDING CASE-For the reasons expressed in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, Ruth Crooks' and Wanda Malcom's motion to remand, #5 , is GRANTED. This action is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 04/13/2022. (AKD)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 04/13/2022. (AKD)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ruth Crooks, Wanda Malcolm. (Lyons, Champ)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Conventional Filing by Murrows Transfer Inc, Bradley Powell re #7 Response in Opposition to Motion (DeLisle, Sara) Modified text on 3/23/2022 (AKD).
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Murrows Transfer Inc, Bradley Powell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(DeLisle, Sara)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ruth Crooks, Wanda Malcolm; To the extent that the defendants wish to be heard before the court rules on the motion, their response is due by March 23, 2022. The plaintiffs' reply, if any, is due by March 28, 2022. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 03/18/2022. (AKD)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ruth Crooks, Wanda Malcolm. (Lyons, Champ)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE pursuant to notice of removal this case is re-set for a Jury Trial on 10/16/2023 at 09:00 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. (KSS)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS reminding parties of their obligations under FRCP 26(f) - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 3/2/2022. (KSS)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL- Rule 26 Meeting Report due by May 2,2022; Pretrial Conference set for September 12, 2023 at 9:30 a.m. and Bench Trial set for October 16,2023 at 09:00 a.m. BOTH in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 03/01/2022. (AKD)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Answer to Amended Complaint deemed filed in Jefferson County Court on 6/25/2021 by Murrow's Transfer Inc. (AKD)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Answer to Amended Complaint deemed filed in Jefferson County Court on 8/16/2021 by Bradley Powell (AKD)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number B4601118785 (AKD)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Murrows Transfer Inc (AKD)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Murrows Transfer Inc from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-CV-2021-900712.00., filed by Murrows Transfer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Certificate of Removal)(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crooks et al v. Murrows Transfer Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Crooks
Represented By: Champ Lyons, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Malcolm
Represented By: Champ Lyons, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murrows Transfer Inc
Represented By: Anna Cerise Saunders
Represented By: Sara Elizabeth DeLisle
Represented By: Thomas L Oliver, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Powell
Represented By: Anna Cerise Saunders
Represented By: Sara Elizabeth DeLisle
Represented By: Thomas L Oliver, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?