Clark v. Stones River Electric et al
Plaintiff: Tyler Willis Clark
Defendant: Stones River Electric, TLC Investments LLC and Charles Jacob Brady
Case Number: 2:2022cv00277
Filed: March 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Nicholas A Danella
Referring Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Certain deadlines apply as further set out within including: Discovery due April 20, 2023; Dispositive Motions due May 4, 2023; a joint status report is due on or before April 3, 2023; a Status Conference is set for Monday, April 10, 2023 at 11:00 a.m., by Zoom. The court will provide the Zoom information to the parties by e-mail, one week prior to the conference. This case should be trial ready by June 2023. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 4/13/2022. (DNW)
April 11, 2022 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wright, Joshua)
April 8, 2022 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Charles Jacob Brady. (DNW)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with Appendices I, II and III attached. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 3/22/2022. (FNC)
March 22, 2022 Filing 8 Case Reassigned to Judge Anna M Manasco. Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 2:22-cv-00277-AMM on all subsequent pleadings. (DNW)
March 22, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B Stewart on behalf of Stones River Electric, TLC Investments LLC (Stewart, Robert)
March 22, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Stones River Electric, TLC Investments LLC.(Peddy, A)
March 14, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Stones River Electric served on 3/10/2022, answer due 3/31/2022; TLC Investments LLC served on 3/10/2022, answer due 3/31/2022. (DNW)
March 7, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Charles Jacob Brady, Stones River Electric, TLC Investments LLC. Mailed certified mail. (DNW)
March 3, 2022 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4029268 (B4601118869). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Tyler Willis Clark.(DNW). (Wright, Joshua) Modified on 3/4/2022 (DNW, ).
March 2, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR TRIAL: You must complete the attached form to indicate whether you consent to proceed before the assigned magistrate judge or decline to proceed before the assigned magistrate judge. (DNW)
March 2, 2022 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Tyler Willis Clark. (DNW)
March 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Tyler Willis Clark.(DNW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Stones River Electric et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Willis Clark
Represented By: Joshua W Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stones River Electric
Represented By: A Joe Peddy
Represented By: Robert B Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TLC Investments LLC
Represented By: A Joe Peddy
Represented By: Robert B Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Jacob Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?