Warren v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Craig Warren
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv00651
Filed: May 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Nicholas A Danella
Referring Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2023 Filing 21 CLERK'S COURT MINUTE ENTRY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF PARTIE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the parties stipulated to dismissal of this action with prejudice. (Doc. #20) Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 4/11/2023. (DNW)
April 11, 2023 Filing 20 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Holtsford, Alex)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: The Court GRANTS #18 Motion for Extension of Time. Discovery deadline of April 30, 2023. Dispositive motion deadline of May 30, 2023 Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 3/16/2023. (DNW)
March 14, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time for Extension of Deadlines by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Holtsford, Alex)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 8/16/2022. (DNW)
August 15, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Protective Order by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Paul)
August 15, 2022 Filing 15 REQUEST for Production of Documents by Progressive Direct Insurance Company.(Miller, Paul)
August 15, 2022 Filing 14 INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Plaintiff by Progressive Direct Insurance Company.(Miller, Paul)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: SCHEDULING ORDER: Certain deadlines apply as further set out within including: Discovery due January 1, 2023; Dispositive Motions due March 18, 2023; a Status Conference is set for May 8, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 7B of the Hugo L. Black US Courthouse. This case should be trial ready by July 2023. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 8/10/2022. (DNW)
August 9, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by S Anthony Higgins on behalf of Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Higgins, S)
July 14, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Miller, Paul)
July 7, 2022 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Miller, Paul)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 HAIKALA CHAMBERS INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 7/5/2022. (KEK)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference regarding consent to magistrate jurisdiction that is currently set for Monday, June 13, 2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on May 26, 2022. (MEB2)
May 26, 2022 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala. Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 2:22-cv-00651-MHH on all subsequent pleadings. (DNW)
May 24, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Miller, Paul)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Pursuant to General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge no later than July 7, 2022. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after July 7, 2022. A telephone conference is hereby SET for 10:00 AM on Monday, June 13, 2022. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-363-4735 access code 6785641. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on May 23, 2022. (MEB2)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/27/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on May 23, 2022. (MEB2)
May 23, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Progressive Direct Insurance Company.(Holtsford, Alex)
May 20, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR TRIAL. You must complete the attached form to indicate whether you consent to proceed before the assigned magistrate judge or decline to proceed before the assigned magistrate judge. (DNW) Modified docket text on 5/23/2022 (DNW, ).
May 20, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Progressive Direct Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2022-901093 filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (DNW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Warren
Represented By: James S Roberts, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Represented By: Alex Lafayette Holtsford, Jr
Represented By: Paul A Miller
Represented By: S Anthony Higgins
Represented By: Steven Anthony Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?