Shepherd v. New York Life Insurance & Annuity Corporation
Plaintiff: James Shepherd, Jr
Defendant: New York Life Insurance & Annuity Corporation
Case Number: 2:2022cv00701
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/26/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/22/2022. (BST, )
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER-Pursuant to the General Order for Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than September 6, 2022. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is DIRECTED to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after September 6, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 07/22/2022. (AKD)
July 20, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by New York Life Insurance & Annuity Corporation.(Bolus, John)
July 20, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New York Life Insurance & Annuity Corporation. filed by New York Life Insurance & Annuity Corporation (Bolus, John)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER:The defendant's unopposed motion to extend the responsive pleading deadline is GRANTED. (Doc. #5 ). The defendant SHALL respond to the complaint by July 20, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 06/29/2022. (AKD)
June 29, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: New York Life Insurance & Annuity Corporation answer due 7/20/2022. (AKD)
June 28, 2022 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint Motion is RIPE 6/28/2022. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by New York Life Insurance & Annuity Corporation. (Bolus, John)
June 13, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Shepherd, Jr. New York Life Insurance & Annuity Corporation served on 6/9/2022, answer due 6/30/2022. (KAM)
June 7, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to New York Life Insurance & Annuity Corporation. Mailed certified mail. (AKD)
June 7, 2022 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4102099 (ALND reciept# B4601120636). related document #1 COMPLAINT against New York Life Insurance & Annuity Corporation, filed by James Shepherd, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(AKD). (Methvin, R) Modified on 6/7/2022 (AKD).
June 6, 2022 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by James Shepherd, Jr. (Yancey, Perry)
June 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York Life Insurance & Annuity Corporation, filed by James Shepherd, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shepherd v. New York Life Insurance & Annuity Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Shepherd, Jr
Represented By: Perry Michael Yancey
Represented By: Courtney Cooper Gipson
Represented By: R G Methvin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Life Insurance & Annuity Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Moore
Represented By: John N Bolus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?