Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company v. Lovette Properties LLC et al
Plaintiff: Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Defendant: Lovette Properties LLC doing business as Lovette Construction doing business as Lovette Design + Build, Clint Lovette, Scott Wheeler, Julie Wheeler, Allison Adams, Carl Adams, Will Ferniany and Dana Ferniany
Case Number: 2:2022cv00738
Filed: June 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Nicholas A Danella
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2022 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company (Bahakel, A)
August 11, 2022 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company (Bahakel, A)
August 1, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Julie Wheeler, Scott Wheeler.(Edge, H)
August 1, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Dana Ferniany, Will Ferniany.(Edge, H)
August 1, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Allison Adams, Carl Adams.(Edge, H)
July 25, 2022 Filing 10 Alias Summons Issued as to Clint Lovette and Lovette Properties LLC. Returned to plaintiff for service. (DNW)
July 8, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Allison Adams, Carl Adams, Dana Ferniany, Will Ferniany, Julie Wheeler, Scott Wheeler. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
July 7, 2022 Filing 8 Request for service by certified mail filed by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Ely, Brenen)
June 24, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Clint Lovette served on 6/24/2022, answer due 7/15/2022; Lovette Properties LLC served on 6/24/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. (DNW)
June 23, 2022 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4111645 (B4601120898). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Allison Adams, Carl Adams, Dana Ferniany, Will Ferniany, Clint Lovette, Lovette Properties LLC, Julie Wheeler, Scott Wheeler, filed by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company.(KAM). (Ely, Brenen) Modified on 6/23/2022 (DNW).
June 21, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Clint Lovette, Lovette Properties LLC via certified mail. (DNW)
June 16, 2022 Filing 5 Evidentiary Material re: #1 Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Ely, Brenen)
June 14, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR TRIAL. You must complete the attached form to indicate whether you consent to proceed before the assigned magistrate judge or decline to proceed before the assigned magistrate judge. (DNW)
June 13, 2022 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (KAM)
June 13, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company (KAM)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allison Adams, Carl Adams, Dana Ferniany, Will Ferniany, Clint Lovette, Lovette Properties LLC, Julie Wheeler, Scott Wheeler, filed by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company v. Lovette Properties LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: A Mark Bahakel
Represented By: Brenen G Ely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lovette Properties LLC doing business as Lovette Construction doing business as Lovette Design + Build
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clint Lovette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Wheeler
Represented By: H Arthur Edge, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Wheeler
Represented By: H Arthur Edge, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Adams
Represented By: H Arthur Edge, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Adams
Represented By: H Arthur Edge, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Ferniany
Represented By: H Arthur Edge, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Ferniany
Represented By: H Arthur Edge, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?