Whitworth v. Alabama, State of et al
Petitioner: Ronald Loyd Whitworth, Jr
Respondent: Alabama, State of and Attorney General of the State of Alabama
Case Number: 2:2022cv00881
Filed: July 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION To Reconsider Denial of Leave to Amend 2254 Petition by Ronald Loyd Whitworth, Jr. (DNW)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Respondents' Answers are due on or before 10/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 09/09/2022. (SUH)
September 8, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Alabama, State of. (Dodd, Stephen)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: It is ORDERED that the motion (Doc. 8) is DENIED. It is ORDERED that these motions (Docs. 9 & 14) are DENIED. It is ORDERED that this motion (Doc. 13) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 8/30/2022. (DNW)
August 29, 2022 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED GRANTING OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND 2254 PETITION by Ronald Loyd Whitworth, Jr. (JLC)
August 29, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION TO EXPAND THE RECORD by Ronald Loyd Whitworth, Jr. (JLC)
August 29, 2022 Filing 12 Stipulation for Entry of Order by Ronald Loyd Whitworth, Jr. (JLC)
August 29, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attempt to Resolve by Agreement of the Parties by Ronald Loyd Whitworth, Jr. (JLC)
August 16, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen N Dodd on behalf of Alabama, State of, Attorney General of the State of Alabama (Dodd, Stephen)
August 15, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Amend 2254 Petition by Ronald Loyd Whitworth, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Amended 2254 Petition)(KEK)
August 15, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Direct Transmittal of pages of the Record on Appeal by Ronald Loyd Whitworth, Jr. (KEK)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Whitworth has filed a motion to stay and hold his petition in abeyance until the release of a "Forensic Document Examination Report." Doc. #3 . Upon review, it is ORDERED that this motion (Doc. #3 ) is DENIED. Whitworth also has filed a motion to direct the State of Alabama to supply the court with his "Second Supplemental Record on Appeal." Doc. #4 . The court will review the state-court evidence to be supplied by the respondents and any other evidence necessary to the disposition of Whitworth's petition in due course. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the motion (Doc. #4 ) is DENIED. Finally, Whitworth has filed a motion to be allowed to file a reply to the respondents' response. Doc. #5 . For good cause, it is ORDERED that this motion (Doc. #5 ) is GRANTED. Accordingly, the respondents are ORDERED to appear and show cause in writing within 30 days why the petition should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 8/10/2022. (KEK)
July 21, 2022 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number ALND B206. (KEK)
July 15, 2022 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE re: case number. (KEK)
July 15, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to be Allowed to Reply to Any Government Response by Ronald Loyd Whitworth, Jr. (KEK)
July 15, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Direct Transmittal of Second Supplemental Record on Appeal and to Incorporate this Record on Appeal by Ronald Loyd Whitworth, Jr. (KEK)
July 15, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay and Abeyance by Ronald Loyd Whitworth, Jr. (KEK)
July 15, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE re: filing fee by Ronald Loyd Whitworth, Jr. (KEK)
July 15, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Ronald Loyd Whitworth, Jr.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitworth v. Alabama, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald Loyd Whitworth, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alabama, State of
Represented By: Stephen N Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Alabama
Represented By: Stephen N Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?