Surles v. Conn et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Surles
Defendant: Daniel Conn, Blalock, Jones, Alabama, State of, Limestone Correctional Facility and Wexford Health Services
Case Number: 2:2022cv01025
Filed: August 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff Christopher Surles filed a pro se complaint pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983, alleging violations of his rights under the Constitution or laws of the United States. (Doc. 1). Surles has moved to amend his complaint to request a jury trial, and monetary, declaratory, and injunctive relief. (Doc. 7). Upon due consideration, Surles' motion to amend the complaint to request a jury trial, and monetary, declaratory, and injunctive relief is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/28/2022. (DNW)
September 20, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment by Christopher Surles. (DNW)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: consistent with the plaintiff's Prisoner Consent Form (copy attached), the warden or chief jailer of the plaintiffs housing facility is DIRECTED to deduct and withhold from any deposits into any of the plaintiff's inmate accounts at the facility a sum equivalent to 20% of the total deposits each month after the first $10. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/29/2022. (DNW)
August 26, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of signed Prisoner Consent Form by Christopher Surles. (JLC)
August 15, 2022 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge John H England, III. ***Forgot to initially assign mag to case*** (KEK)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER terming motion or declaration for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, plaintiff is not required to pay a partial filing fee, plaintiff is required to return signed attached consent form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/12/2022. (KAM)
August 11, 2022 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re: case number. (KEK)
August 11, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Surles. (KEK)
August 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alabama, State of, Blalock, Daniel Conn, Jones, Limestone Correctional Facility, Wexford Health Services, filed by Christopher Surles.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Surles v. Conn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Surles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Conn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blalock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Limestone Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?