Whitehead v. United States of America
Petitioner: Mark Rory Whitehead
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2022cv08026
Filed: July 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING SUMMARY DISPOSITION; The court gives Mr. Whitehead until on or before September 29, 2022 to supply any additional evidentiary materials or legal arguments he may wish to offer regarding whether the motion is subject to summary disposition. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/8/2022. (JLC)
September 2, 2022 Filing 6 RESPONSE to MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255 filed by United States of America. (Hundscheid, John)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS the Government's "Unopposed Motion to Extend Response Deadline" (doc. 4) and EXTENDS the time for the Government to respond to the court's Order to Show Cause (doc. 2) to on or before September 2, 2022. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 8/3/2022. (MMW)
August 3, 2022 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Order to Show Cause, #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by United States of America. (Hundscheid, John)
July 22, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John Mark Hundscheid on behalf of United States of America (Hundscheid, John)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; The court hereby ORDERS the Government to APPEAR and SHOW CAUSE in writing, on or before August 19, 2022, why the court should not grant the relief requested by Mr. Whitehead. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 7/19/2022. (JLC)
July 13, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255, filed by Mark Rory Whitehead.(2:19-cr-42-KOB-JEO)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitehead v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Rory Whitehead
Represented By: Samuel R Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Prim F. Escalona, US Attorney
Represented By: Clint Locke
Represented By: J Alan Baty
Represented By: Melissa Kay Atwood
Represented By: John Mark Hundscheid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?