Harper v. United States of America
Petitioner: Antoine Harper
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2022cv08028
Filed: July 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 08/23/2022. (ANB)
August 19, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response by United States of America. (Camp, John)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Antoine Harper, hereinafter referred to as the movant, has filed with the Clerk of this Court a motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255 (Doc. #1 ). It is hereby ORDERED that the United States appear and file its answer in accordance with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2255 Proceedings, within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/25/2022. (MEB2)
July 22, 2022 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re: case number. (KEK)
July 22, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Antoine Harper.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harper v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antoine Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Prim F. Escalona, US Attorney
Represented By: Christopher W Johnson
Represented By: Enid D Athanas
Represented By: Joseph Paul Montminy
Represented By: John G Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?