Iron City Plumbing LLC v. Iron City Plumbing Contractors LLC
Plaintiff: Iron City Plumbing LLC
Defendant: Iron City Plumbing Contractors LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv00132
Filed: February 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: Before the court is the unopposed #11 Motion to Stay the Parties' Obligations under Rule 26 until the court decides the motion to dismiss. The motion is GRANTED to the extent that the court will generally continue the parties' obligations under Rule 26 and will reset the deadlines, if necessary, after an order on the motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 03/31/2023. (SUH)
March 31, 2023 Filing 12 REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Iron City Plumbing Contractors LLC re: #9 Response in Opposition to Motion, #5 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION re #1 Complaint Cancellation of trademark registration and application filed by Iron City Plumbing Contractors LLC. (Watson, Joseph)
March 31, 2023 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Stay re #7 Order by Iron City Plumbing Contractors LLC. (Watson, Joseph)
March 28, 2023 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden filed by Iron City Plumbing LLC, Iron City Plumbing Contractors LLC (KAM)
March 23, 2023 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION re #1 Complaint Cancellation of trademark registration and application filed by Iron City Plumbing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Adams, James)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that parties are REQUIRED to enter an election pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than April 23, 2023; parties are directed to use the magistrate judge consent form on the CM/ECF system to elect or decline the exercise of magistrate judge jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on March 17, 2023. (ASL)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on March 17, 2023. (ASL)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Before the court is Defendant's #5 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a response to the motion on or before March 24, 2023, and Defendant may file a reply on or before March 31, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 03/10/2023. (SUH)
March 9, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION for Attorney Fees , MOTION re #1 Complaint Cancellation of trademark registration and application by Iron City Plumbing Contractors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Affidavit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Watson, Joseph)
February 16, 2023 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Iron City Plumbing Contractors, LLC c/o Registered Agents Inc. on 02/16/2023, filed by Iron City Plumbing LLC. (Adams, James)
February 14, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Iron City Plumbing Contractors LLC delivered to plaintiff for service. (KAM)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TEXT ORDER: The docket sheet does not reflect payment of the filing fee or a motion to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP). Plaintiff is ORDERED to either pay the fee or file a motion for IFP on or before 02/10/2023 or the complaint will be subject to dismissal without further order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 02/06/2023. (SUH)
February 6, 2023 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4265182. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Iron City Plumbing Contractors LLC, filed by Iron City Plumbing LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(KAM). (Adams, James) NDAL rec# B-3579 Modified on 2/7/2023 (KAM).
February 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Iron City Plumbing Contractors LLC, filed by Iron City Plumbing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iron City Plumbing LLC v. Iron City Plumbing Contractors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iron City Plumbing LLC
Represented By: James Hunter Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iron City Plumbing Contractors LLC
Represented By: Joseph Ellis Watson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?