Watkins v. Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Nolan Watkins
Defendant: Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company, The and Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 2:2023cv00335
Filed: March 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 20109 - Federal Railroad Safety Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER. Certain deadlines and time limits apply, as set out herein. Discovery due by 2/29/2024; Dispositive Motions due by 3/15/2024; Joint Status Report due by 2/20/2024; Status Conference set for 2/26/2024 at 11:15 AM by Zoom, before Judge Anna M Manasco. The court will provide the zoom information to the parties by separate email. This case should be trial ready by June 2024. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 4/21/2023. (FNC)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 4/21/2023. (FNC)
April 20, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Hipaa Order - JOINT by Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company, The, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graham, John)
April 17, 2023 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Graham, John)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with Appendices I, II and III attached. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 4/14/2023. (FNC)
April 13, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT-The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Anna M. Manasco. Please use case number 2:23 CV 335 AMM on all subsequent pleadings. (AKD)
April 7, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company, The, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. filed by Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company, The, Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Graham, John)
April 7, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company, The, Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Graham, John)
March 17, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company, The, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (AKD)
March 17, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nolan Watkins. Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company, The served on 3/17/2023, answer due 4/7/2023. (Burge, F)
March 17, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nolan Watkins. Norfolk Southern Railway Company served on 3/17/2023, answer due 4/7/2023. (Burge, F)
March 17, 2023 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4296605 (ALND receipt# B-4309). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company, The, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, filed by Nolan Watkins.(AKD). (Burge, F) Modified on 3/17/2023 (AKD).
March 16, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD)
March 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company, The, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, filed by Nolan Watkins.(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins v. Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nolan Watkins
Represented By: F Tucker Burge, Sr.
Represented By: Frank Tucker Burge, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company, The
Represented By: John M Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: John M Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?