Davinci Lock, LLC v. SpiderDoor, LLC
Plaintiff: Davinci Lock, LLC
Defendant: SpiderDoor, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv00343
Filed: March 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Nicholas A Danella
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference regarding consent to magistrate jurisdiction that is currently set for Tuesday, May 23, 2023 is RESET for Tuesday, May 30, 2023, at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Danella. The parties should dial (888) 363-4735 and enter access code 6785641 to participate in the conference. The parties are reminded that they are required to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by no later than June 15, 2023. The telephone conference will be cancelled by separate order if all parties have submitted their elections beforehand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 5/15/2023. (JLC)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by no later than June 15, 2023. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after June 15, 2023.A Telephone Status Conference is hereby SET for 10:00 AMon Tuesday, May 23, 2023. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-363-4735 access code 6785641 five minutes prior to the start time of the conference. Telephone Conference set for 5/23/2023 10:00 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 5/1/2023. (JLC) Modified on 5/3/2023 (JLC).
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26, reminding the parties of their obligations under FRCP 26(f). Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/5/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 5/1/2023. (JLC)
April 28, 2023 Filing 13 Verified ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Davinci Lock, LLC by SpiderDoor, LLC.(Breithaupt, Eric)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER GRANTING Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorneys Andrew Shores, Robert Van Arnam, and Richard Matthews. Doc. #8 , Doc. #9 , Doc. #10 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 4/4/2023. (JLC)
April 4, 2023 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SpiderDoor, LLC. filed by SpiderDoor, LLC (Breithaupt, Eric)
April 3, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Richard Matthews by Davinci Lock, LLC. (Pruet, David)
April 3, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert Van Arnam by Davinci Lock, LLC. (Pruet, David)
April 3, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew Shores by Davinci Lock, LLC. (Pruet, David)
April 3, 2023 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4308920 (B4548). (Pruet, David) Modified on 4/4/2023 (MEB2).
April 3, 2023 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4308914 (B4547). (Pruet, David) Modified on 4/4/2023 (MEB2).
April 3, 2023 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4308922 (B4549). (Pruet, David) Modified on 4/4/2023 (MEB2).
March 28, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Breithaupt on behalf of SpiderDoor, LLC (Breithaupt, Eric)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The parties' "Joint Motion For 21-Day Extension Of Time For Defendant To Respond To Complaint" (Doc. #5 ) is GRANTED. Defendant's responsive pleading is due on or before May 1, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 3/24/2023. (KSS)
March 23, 2023 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time by Davinci Lock, LLC. (Pruet, David)
March 21, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Davinci Lock, LLC. filed by Davinci Lock, LLC (Pruet, David)
March 20, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SpiderDoor, LLC, returned to Plaintiff for service on this the 20th day of March, 2023. (JLC)
March 20, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF A CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR TRIAL. (JLC)
March 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SpiderDoor, LLC, filed by Davinci Lock, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(KSS)
March 17, 2023 Filing Fee received in the amount of $402.00, Credit Card receipt_number AALNDC-4297358, NDAL receipt #B4330. (Pruet, David) Modified on 3/20/2023 (JLC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davinci Lock, LLC v. SpiderDoor, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davinci Lock, LLC
Represented By: David R Pruet, III
Represented By: Meghan Salvati Cole
Represented By: Andrew Shores
Represented By: Richard Matthews
Represented By: Robert Van Arnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpiderDoor, LLC
Represented By: Eric J. Breithaupt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?