Crews v. Sgt. Gaston et al
Plaintiff: Kamiles Crews
Defendant: Sgt. Gaston, Officer Clark, Officer Grace and Lt. Mitchell
Case Number: 2:2023cv00863
Filed: July 5, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Prisoner Consent by Kamiles Crews (DNW)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER It is ORDERED that the #2 application to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Plaintiff is not required to pay a partial filing fee, plaintiff is required to return signed attached consent form within 30 days. The Clerk is DIRECTED to provide a cop of this order to the plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 8/2/2023. (KSS)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of filing re: mail by Kamiles Crews (DNW)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Show Cause by Kamiles Crews. (DNW)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE to prisoner. (DNW)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kamiles Crews. (DNW)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kamiles Crews.(DNW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crews v. Sgt. Gaston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamiles Crews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Gaston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?