Henson v. United States Probation Office of the Northern District of Alabama et al
Plaintiff: Jeffery Todd Henson, Sr
Defendant: United States Probation Office of the Northern District of Alabama, Brooke Cobb, Alicia Spings and Candy Cheatham
Case Number: 2:2023cv01639
Filed: December 4, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act / Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Production of Records by Jeffery Todd Henson, Sr. (LCB)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or Declaratory Relief. by Jeffery Todd Henson, Sr. (LCB)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER:The warden/chief jailer is DIRECTED to deduct and withhold from any deposits into plaintiff's account at the facility until a total of $320.55 has been paid to the Clerk of Court to satisfy the remaining balance of the filing fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to serve this order and a copy of the plaintiff's signed Prisoner Consent Form on the warden/chief jailer at the plaintiff's housing facility. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 1/5/2024. (LCB)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE - Letter to Court by Jeffery Todd Henson, Sr (AHI)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Motion for Various Relief by Jeffery Todd Henson, Sr. (LCB)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Prisoner Consent Form by Jeffery Todd Henson, Sr (LCB)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order PLRA Initial Partial Filing fee: $ 29.45, receipt number B-9183 (AHI)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court GRANTS #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is ORDERED to sign the Prisoner Consent form and return with a check in the amount of the partial filing fee within 30 days to the Clerk of Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 12/11/2023. (LCB)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE regarding case number. (KAM)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeffery Todd Henson, Sr. (KAM)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Candy Cheatham, Brooke Cobb, Alicia Spings, United States Probation Office of the Northern District of Alabama, filed by Jeffery Todd Henson, Sr.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henson v. United States Probation Office of the Northern District of Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Todd Henson, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Probation Office of the Northern District of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooke Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Spings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candy Cheatham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?