Birmingham Realty Company v. KabaFusion Holdings LLC et al
Plaintiff: Birmingham Realty Company
Defendant: KabaFusion Holdings LLC and Coram Healthcare Corporation of Alabama
Case Number: 2:2024cv00492
Filed: April 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER-Certain time limits apply as set out herein. Discovery due by 12/20/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 1/17/2025. The parties shall be ready for trial on or before May 19, 2025, to be scheduled by separate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 05/23/2024. (AKD)
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 05/15/2024. (AKD)
May 15, 2024 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge (AKD)
May 15, 2024 The Telephone Conference set for May 20, 2024 is CANCELLED. (AKD)
May 13, 2024 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Dukes, Carter)
May 13, 2024 Filing 9 REPLY Brief filed by Defendants Coram Healthcare Corporation of Alabama, KabaFusion Holdings LLC re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement, #4 Brief filed by Coram Healthcare Corporation of Alabama, KabaFusion Holdings LLC. (Geisler, Kimberly)
May 6, 2024 Filing 8 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiff Birmingham Realty Company re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Birmingham Realty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Skinner, David)
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 04/30/2024. (AKD)
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER-Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than June 3, 2024. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after June 3, 2024.A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 11:00 a.m. on May 20, 2024. The parties are DIRECTED to call 205-931-0422 to access the telephone conference. The conference ID is 637 648 757. The parties should call in five minutes prior to the start time of the conference. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 04/30/2024. (AKD)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT SUBMISSION ORDER re #3 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement. Plaintiff shall file any opposition or other response to the motion by May 6, 2024; Defendants may reply by May 13, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 4/22/2024. (SJB)
April 19, 2024 Filing 4 Brief re #3 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Coram Healthcare Corporation of Alabama, KabaFusion Holdings LLC. (Dukes, Carter)
April 19, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement by Coram Healthcare Corporation of Alabama, KabaFusion Holdings LLC. (Dukes, Carter)
April 19, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD)
April 19, 2024 State Court Complaint deemed filed in Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL on 3/8/2024. (AKD)
April 19, 2024 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 405, receipt_number AALNDC-4574141 (ALND receipt# B-11137). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by KabaFusion Holdings LLC, Coram Healthcare Corporation of Alabama from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL, case number 01-CV-2024-901069.00., filed by KabaFusion Holdings LLC, Coram Healthcare Corporation of Alabama. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(AKD). (Dukes, Carter) Modified on 4/19/2024 (AKD).
April 18, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by KabaFusion Holdings LLC, Coram Healthcare Corporation of Alabama from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL, case number 01-CV-2024-901069.00., filed by KabaFusion Holdings LLC, Coram Healthcare Corporation of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Birmingham Realty Company v. KabaFusion Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Birmingham Realty Company
Represented By: David C Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KabaFusion Holdings LLC
Represented By: Carter H Dukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coram Healthcare Corporation of Alabama
Represented By: Carter H Dukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?