Sabbah v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Plaintiff: Ibrahim Sabbah doing business as Bessemer Fuel Stop #3
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture, Tom Vilsack, Cindy Long, United States of America and Elizabeth Allen
Case Number: 2:2024cv00915
Filed: July 10, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act / Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States of America. Returned to Plaintiff for service.(AKD)
August 16, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Elizabeth Allen, Cindy Long, United States Department of Agriculture, Tom Vilsack, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (AKD)
July 16, 2024 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 405, receipt_number AALNDC-4635329 (ALND receipt# B-12567). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Elizabeth Allen, Cindy Long, United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America, Tom Vilsack, filed by Ibrahim Sabbah.(AKD). (Hughes, Clayton) Modified on 7/16/2024 (AKD).
July 11, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD)
July 10, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Elizabeth Allen, Cindy Long, United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America, Tom Vilsack, filed by Ibrahim Sabbah.(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sabbah v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Vilsack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ibrahim Sabbah doing business as Bessemer Fuel Stop #3
Represented By: Clayton M. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?