Miller v. Regions Bank
Plaintiff: Jackie L Miller
Defendant: Regions Bank
Case Number: 2:2024cv01324
Filed: September 27, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE by Regions Bank Report of the Parties' Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Taylor, Meredith)
October 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26(f). Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 10/28/24. (SAC)
September 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER - On or before October 8, 2024, defendant shall pay the filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. If defendant does not comply with this order, the court may REMAND the case to the Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/30/24. (SAC)
September 30, 2024 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 405, receipt_number AALNDC-4691081. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Regions Bank from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-CV-2024-90299. (), filed by Regions Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(CLC). (Taylor, Meredith) ALND Receipt # B-4691083 Modified on 10/1/2024 (CLC).
September 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/29/24. (SAC)
September 27, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Regions Bank. filed by Regions Bank (Taylor, Meredith)
September 27, 2024 Filing 2 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff Jackie L. Miller by Regions Bank.(Taylor, Meredith)
September 27, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Regions Bank from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-CV-2024-90299. (), filed by Regions Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(CLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Regions Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie L Miller
Represented By: H Gregory Harp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Bank
Represented By: Carole G Miller
Represented By: Meredith Smith Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?