Hughes v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Natalie Hughes
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 2:2024cv01454
Filed: October 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS Plaintiff Natalie Hughes's unopposed motion for extension of time to file her brief. Ms. Hughes shall file her brief on or before March 3, 2025. Defendant Commissioner of the Social Security Administration's response is due on or before April 2, 2025. A reply, if any, is due on or before April 16, 2025. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 12/20/2024. (CLC)
December 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief by Natalie Hughes. (Carmichael, Brian)
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY BRIEFING letter to counsel. (CLC)
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Social Security Administration, Commissioner. (Attachments: #1 Certification Page, #2 Court Transcript Index, #3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, #4 Payment Documents and Decisions, #5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #6 Non Disability Related Development, #7 Disability Related Development Part 1, #8 Disability Related Development Part 2, #9 Medical Records Part 1, #10 Medical Records Part 2, #11 Medical Records Part 3, #12 Medical Records Part 4, #13 Medical Records Part 5, #14 Medical Records Part 6, #15 Medical Records Part 7, #16 Medical Records Part 8, #17 Medical Records Part 9, #18 Medical Records Part 10, #19 Medical Records Part 11)(Truong, Long)
November 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 405, receipt_number AALNDC-4714084. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration, filed by Natalie Hughes.(CLC). (Carmichael, Brian) ALND Receipt # B-14591 Modified on 11/4/2024 (CLC).
October 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Carla Ward on behalf of Social Security Administration, Commissioner (Ward, Carla)
October 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Shaun Wilson on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security Administration (Wilson, Jeffrey)
October 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration, filed by Natalie Hughes.(CLC)
October 25, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTICE that counsel is required to provide the plaintiff's social security number to the US Attorney's Office within 10 days. This notice is to be made outside of the CM/ECF filing system. (CLC)
October 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Social Security Answer Deadline by Natalie Hughes. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 10/25/2024, answer due 12/24/2024. (CLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Hughes
Represented By: Brian Roy Carmichael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Represented By: Jeffrey Shaun Wilson
Represented By: Long Truong
Represented By: Carla Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?