Hester v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Nancy Hester
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00067
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 2/28/2019. (AHI)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Liles C. Burke. Please use case number 3:19-cv-00067-LCB on all subsequent pleadings. Judge Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr is no longer assigned to the case. (BJL)
February 1, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Yeilding, Christopher)
January 15, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601094727 (BJL)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the parties are required to enter an election regarding the exercise of jurisdiction by a magistrate judge no later than February 25, 2019; in the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is directed to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after order February 25, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 1/11/2019. (AHI)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that a Telephone Conference is set for 2/11/2019 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 1/11/2019. (AHI )
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26 as more fully set out in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 1/11/2019. (AHI)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Yeilding, Christopher)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. filed by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company (Yeilding, Christopher)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company from The Circuit Court of Colbert County, Alabama, case number 20-CV-2018-900390. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hester v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher L Yeilding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Hester
Represented By: R Willson Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?