Lansdell v. Belk Inc

Plaintiff: Tina Lansdell
Defendant: Belk Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00506
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Belk, Inc. answer due 7/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/27/19. (LBG, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Motion is RIPE 6/27/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Belk Inc. (Warren, David)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Belk, Inc. answer due 6/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/4/19. (LBG, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Motion is RIPE 6/4/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Belk Inc. (Warren, David)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Belk, Inc. answer due 6/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/15/19. (LBG, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Motion is RIPE 5/15/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Belk Inc. (Warren, David)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall file its answer to Plaintiff's complaint by May 17, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 4/22/19. (LBG, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Belk Inc. filed by Belk Inc (Warren, David)
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Motion is RIPE 4/19/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Belk Inc. (Warren, David)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Belk Inc served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. (BJL)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Belk Inc by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL)
March 29, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3312251 (ALNDCLERK19-0015). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Belk Inc filed by Tina Lansdell.(BJL). (Sexton, L) Modified on 4/2/2019 (BJL).
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Tina Lansdell. (BJL)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Belk Inc filed by Tina Lansdell.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lansdell v. Belk Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Lansdell
Represented By: L Landis Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belk Inc
Represented By: David L Warren, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?