Weakley v. Marshall (INMATE 3)

Plaintiff: Timothy Wayne Weakley
Defendant: Steven T Marshall
Case Number: 3:2019cv00549
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Northwestern Office
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Timothy Wayne Weakley. (KAM)
May 30, 2019 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Answer of the Respondent #13 is deemed a motion for summary judgment; See order #14 . (KAM)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - Respondent has filed an answer seeking dismissal of this habeas petition. #13 . The court deems the case ripe for summary disposition; Petitioner shall have twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order to supply any additional evidentiary materials or legal arguments he may wish to offer with regard to whether the petition is subject to summary dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 5/30/2019. (KAM)
May 30, 2019 Filing 13 Respondent's ANSWER to Complaint by Steven T Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Davis, John)
April 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John J Davis on behalf of Steven T Marshall (Davis, John)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; The Respondent is hereby ORDERED to APPEAR and SHOW CAUSE in writing, within forty-two (42) days from the date of this Order, why the relief requested by the Petitioner should not be granted. ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #3 MOTION to Transfer Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 4/18/2019. (JLC)
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Court's #9 Order filed by Timothy Wayne Weakley. (JLC)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #3 Motion to Transfer; Since Weakley did not oppose transfer to this district, it is unclear whether his motion to transfer venue is moot. Accordingly, Weakley is ORDERED to inform the court by April 25, 2019, as to whether he still wishes to transfer the case to the Eastern District of Tennessee. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 4/11/2019. (KAM)
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:19-cv-00162. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 10, 2019 Case transferred to the Northern District of Alabama; Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/10/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: 1) The magistrate judge's #4 recommendation is adopted; 2) This case is transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of AL pursuant to 28 USC 1631; 3) Plf's #3 motion for change of venue is left for resolution by the transferee court; DIRECTING the Clerk to take appropriate steps to effect the transfer; This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/10/2019.]
April 1, 2019 No objections filed to the #4 Recommendation. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/10/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: DIRECTING the Clerk to docket Doc. No. #5 (currently docketed as an Objection to Report and Recommendation) as a "Notice" by Petitioner. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 3/14/2019. (alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/10/2019.]
March 14, 2019 NOTICE by Timothy Wayne Weakley, as considered in the Court's #6 Order. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #5 for pdf) (alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/10/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 (NOTICE) OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendation by Timothy Wayne Weakley. (alm, ) Modified on 3/14/2019 to clarify the docket text to reflect this entry as a "notice", pursuant to the Court's #6 Order (alm, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/10/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama under 28 USC 1631; Objections to R&R due by 3/25/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 3/11/2019. (alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/10/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Transfer of Venue by Timothy Wayne Weakley. (alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/10/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Timothy Wayne Weakley. (alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/10/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.00, receipt number 4602052604), filed by Timothy Wayne Weakley. (alm, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2019: #1 Receipt) (alm, ). Modified on 3/8/2019 to add the receipt which was originally omitted in error (alm, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weakley v. Marshall (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Wayne Weakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T Marshall
Represented By: John J Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?