Reaves v. The City of Tuscumbia et al
Plaintiff: Clayborn Dee Reaves
Defendant: Luster Echols, Mayor Kerry Underwood and The City of Tuscumbia
Case Number: 3:2019cv00762
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE that the motion to proceed IFP is GRANTED and this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for not stating a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/22/2019. (AHI)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: Case Reassigned to Judge Judge Liles C. Burke. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 3:19-cv-762-LCB on all subsequent pleadings. (BJL)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REASSIGNMENT ORDER: the court DIRECTS the Clerk to reassign the case to a District Judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/22/19. (BJL)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 5/20/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Clayborn Dee Reaves. (BJL)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Luster Echols, The City of Tuscumbia, and Kerry Underwood filed by Clayborn Dee Reaves.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reaves v. The City of Tuscumbia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayborn Dee Reaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luster Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Kerry Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Tuscumbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?