Reaves v. The City of Tuscumbia et al
Plaintiff: Clayborn Dee Reaves
Defendant: Luster Echols, Mayor Kerry Underwood and The City of Tuscumbia
Case Number: 3:2019cv00793
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Despite several attempts, the court could not secure counsel to represent plaintiff. Accordingly, the court VACATES that specific portion of the order entered June 4, 2019, and DENIES the motion to appoint counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/18/19. (BJL)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Quash Service by Luster Echols, Kerry Underwood. (Debro, John)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Quash Service by The City of Tuscumbia. (Debro, John)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Luster Echols served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019; The City of Tuscumbia served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019; Kerry Underwood served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (BJL)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Luster Echols, The City of Tuscumbia, and Kerry Underwood by Clerk and delivered to USMS for service. (BJL)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/4/19. (BJL)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 5/24/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Clayborn Dee Reaves. (BJL)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Luster Echols, The City of Tuscumbia, and Kerry Underwood filed by Clayborn Dee Reaves.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reaves v. The City of Tuscumbia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayborn Dee Reaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luster Echols
Represented By: John Mark Debro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Kerry Underwood
Represented By: John Mark Debro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Tuscumbia
Represented By: John Mark Debro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?