Metcalf v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Roderick Burrell Metcalf
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00980
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the Northern District of California for inclusion in MDL 2741; case transferred electronically to Clerk of Court in Northern District of California. (BJL)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Roderick Burrell Metcalf. Monsanto Company waiver sent on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Brandt, Christine)
June 25, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3377384 (B4601098648). related document #1 COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against Monsanto Company filed by Roderick Burrell Metcalf.(AHI ). (Brandt, Christine)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against Monsanto Company filed by Roderick Burrell Metcalf.(AHI )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metcalf v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick Burrell Metcalf
Represented By: Christine C Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?