Morrow v. Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc

Plaintiff: Sarah Vickers Morrow
Defendant: Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01094
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE Certification to Court by William V. Westbrook, III (Westbrook, William)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER this case is before the court on #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or for a Summary Judgment filed by Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc ; The parties are reminded of thebriefing schedule outlined in Appendix II attached hereto. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 9/3/2019. (KAM)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William V.Westbrook, III. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 9/3/2019. (KAM)
September 3, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $75, receipt number 1126-3425699 (ALND B 4601100287). (Westbrook, William) Modified on 9/4/2019 (AFS).
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Randi P. Mueller)(Westbrook, William)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 Brief re #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or for a Summary Judgment filed by Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc. (Mueller, Randi)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or for a Summary Judgment by Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A AL State & City License, #2 Exhibit B Bankruptcy Docket Report)(Mueller, Randi)
August 21, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc answer due 8/30/2019. (AFS)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendant's responsive pleading is due 8/30/2019. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 8/9/2019. (AFS)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc. (Mueller, Randi)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Randi Peresich Mueller on behalf of Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc (Mueller, Randi)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (AFS)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc. mailed certified mail. (AFS)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David J Philipps and Mary E. Philipps. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/15/2019. (AFS)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald C Sykstus on behalf of Sarah Vickers Morrow (Sykstus, Ronald)
July 15, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $75, (ALND B460109919) receipt number 1126-3389648. (Philipps, David) Modified on 7/15/2019 (AFS.
July 15, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $75, (ALND B460109918) receipt number 1126-3389640. (Philipps, David) Modified on 7/15/2019 (AFS).
July 15, 2019 Filing Fee: $400, receipt_number 1126-3389634 (ALND B4601099117) (Philipps, David) Modified on 7/15/2019 (AFS).
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David J Phillips and Mary E Phillips by Sarah Vickers Morrow. (AFS)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Sarah Vickers Morrow. (AFS)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc, filed by Sarah Vickers Morrow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrow v. Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc
Represented By: Randi Peresich Mueller
Represented By: William V Westbrook, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Vickers Morrow
Represented By: Ronald C Sykstus
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?